+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- No action taken by Corporations, Insurance and Banking by voice vote
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD3681701-S1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to LD3681701-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD3681701-S1
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD3618480