+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 712 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB749ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 082902332-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB749E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 082902332
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2008: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2008: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor