+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1102)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1102 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB747ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 20108346D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N)
- Passed House with substitute (93-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB747H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108346D-H1
- Read third time
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20108346D-H1
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB747S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107387D-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20107387D-S1
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103284D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 26, 2020: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2020: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
February 17, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Emmett W. Hanger, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor