+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Tabled in H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee on Education & Health sub agreed to 050199768-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee on Finance amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - com. sub. w/amd SB744ES1
- Printed as engrossed 050199768-ES1
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 050199768-S1
On January 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Care
On January 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051214768
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2005: Tabled in H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2005: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2005: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor