+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/13)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB744ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (84-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 2-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
- Governor's substitute printed 13105652D-S2
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB744ER)
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference substitute printed 13105502D-S1
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Minchew, Marshall, D.W., Krupicka
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Black, Smith, Favola
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105029D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB744H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13105029D-H1
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB744E
- Printed as engrossed 13101612D-E
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On December 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101612D
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 3, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 2-N)
April 3, 2013: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 13, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Reported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor