+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 709 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB743ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (3-Y 31-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 073496472-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB743H1
- Passed House with substitute Block Vote (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 31-N)
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Cuccinelli, Quayle, Saslaw
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Hogan, Scott, E.T., Shannon
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 073496472-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 075903720-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB743S1
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 2-N 1-A)
- VOTE: (36-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 075903720-S1
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
On October 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077405720
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
February 23, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (3-Y 31-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (36-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor