+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Continued to 2009 in Appropriations by voice vote
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Jones, S.C.)
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 088896232-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB743E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 088896232
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 4, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor