+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0576)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 576 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB741ER)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: FOIA
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB741S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 082407232-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 082407232-S1
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 084809232
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2008: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor