+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB738E
- Printed as engrossed 18101932D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101932D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Rules with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor