+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0897)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 897 (effective 7/1/07)
- Passed by temporarily
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 2-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB738ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB738ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute (Appropriations) agreed to 073507260-H2
- Committee substitute (Health, Welfare and Institutions) rejected 071748720-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB738H2
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 073507260-H2
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources (Hamilton)
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 071748720-H1
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB738S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 072011720-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 072011720-S1
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Involuntary Commitment
On October 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 064689720