+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass in Senate
- No further action taken
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB737S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105133D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16105133D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 16103883D
+ − Votes (3)
February 15, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor