+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 13100546D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB736E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 5-N)
On December 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100546D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2013: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N)
February 6, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
January 22, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
January 18, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Reported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor