+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 817 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB735ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Delegates: Griffith, Kilgore, Valentine
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senators: Smith, Petersen, McEachin
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House with amendment (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 1-N)
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 084782326-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB735E
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 084782326
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
March 5, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 5, 2008: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2008: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 20, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 15, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 2-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor