+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 4-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/16)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB734ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB734ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 16105879D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB734H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (66-Y 30-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105879D-H1
- Read third time
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105879D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB734S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105428D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16105428D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 16104277D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
April 20, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 4-N)
April 20, 2016: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2016: House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
March 8, 2016: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
March 7, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 30-N)
March 2, 2016: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
February 15, 2016: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 15, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2016: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor