+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20108511D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB730S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107866D-S1
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20107866D-S1
- Incorporates SB305 (Stanley)
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 0-N 2-A)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101839D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 0-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Jennifer L. McClellan
Type:
Primary Sponsor