+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 492 (effective 4/12/04)
On March 13, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB73ER)
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N)
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB73S2
- Committee substitute agreed to 040994744-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 043031744-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 040994744-S2
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 043031744-S1
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg. clause pref.01/05/04 042908744
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 1-N)
February 23, 2004: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N)
February 12, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor