+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 66 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB727ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N)
- Passed House (53-Y 44-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 9-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102179D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2020: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N)
February 12, 2020: Reported from Finance (12-Y 9-N)
January 24, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jennifer L. McClellan
Type:
Primary Sponsor