+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 346 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB727ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 082035244
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2008: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor