+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 809 (effective 4/9/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB726ER)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up out of order pursuant to House Rule 52 (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Emergency clause added
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 18105744D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106272D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB726S2
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18105744D-S1
- Incorporates SB795 (Dunnavant)
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102119D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health