+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 696 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB723ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB723S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105130D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105130D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 10104324D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor