+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
On March 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 203 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB722ER)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On December 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 055390728
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor