+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate sustained Governor's veto
- Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N)
- Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB722ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 22107576D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Committee on Transportation amendments rejected
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 22107576D-H1 (Roem)
- Substitute by Delegate Roem agreed to 22107576D-H1
- Passed House with substitute (72-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB722H1
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB722S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105977D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22105977D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 22104307D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (8)
April 27, 2022: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N)
March 8, 2022: House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
March 7, 2022: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N)
March 1, 2022: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N)
February 23, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N)
February 9, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N)
February 7, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2022: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor