+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
On March 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB721ER)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 972703813
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 16, 1997: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor