+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: General Government
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104731D-S1
- Amendment #1 by Senator McEachin withdrawn
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #2 by Senator McEachin agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes yes
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB719ES1
- Printed as engrossed 13104731D-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13104731D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
On December 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101225D
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 4, 2013: Amendment #2 by Senator McEachin agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
February 4, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor