+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
On March 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 185 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB717ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 061312820
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2006: VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor