+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 519 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB716ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N)
- Passed House with amendment (81-Y 18-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB716S1
- Substitute by Senator Petersen agreed to 22106594D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Floor substitute printed 22106594D-S1 (Petersen)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 22104552D