+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 318 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB715ER)
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104086D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB715S1
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13104086D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On November 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100675D
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor