+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
On March 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 348 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB714ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (97-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (18-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 3
On January 24, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD6282722-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Emergency clause deleted
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amd. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to L. G. sub-committee: Charter
On January 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg clause LD6282722
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (18-Y 1-N)
January 20, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 1995: Reported from Local Government w/amd. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor