+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Tabled in Finance (14-Y 6-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 082905324
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2008: Tabled in Finance (14-Y 6-N)
February 15, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
February 13, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor