+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Sen. Gartlan agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Passed by temporarily
- Reengrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as reengrossed 988392661-E
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 988392661-E
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 988392661
- VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (37-Y 0-N)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 1-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 1-N)
February 12, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 1-N)
January 28, 1998: VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE R (37-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor