+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/14)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB71ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB71ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 14105102D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments rejected
- Substitute by Delegate Bell, R.B. agreed to 14105102D-H1
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB71H1
- Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 14105102D-H1 (Bell, Robert B.)
- Read second time
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB71S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103993D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14103993D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103119D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
April 23, 2014: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor