+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 632 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB704ER)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Passed House (93-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Engrossed bill reprinted 084798324-E
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 084798324-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB704E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 084798324
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 29, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2008: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor