+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB704ER)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985413739-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985413739-S1
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 985413739-S1
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 988391739
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor