+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Continued to 2001 in Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 000238544-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 000238544
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2000: Continued to 2001 in Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor