+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (59)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 297 (effective 3/10/18)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB698ER2)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 11-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (29-Y 11-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB698ER)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #4
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Amendments #1, #2 by Senator Chafin withdrawn
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments #3, #4 by Senator Chafin agreed to
- Reengrossed by Senate as amended SB698E2S1
- Printed as reengrossed 18106076D-E2S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106076D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Deeds agreed to
- Emergency clause deleted
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB698ES1
- Printed as engrossed 18106076D-ES1
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106076D-S1
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/18 18104455D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources