+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 689 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB692ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 22106750D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB692H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106750D-H1
- Read third time
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22106750D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB692S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106137D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 22106137D-S1
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 22104491D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2022: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2022: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor