+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
On April 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 734 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB691ER)
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 006192532-S1
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 006192532-S1
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments rejected by conference committee
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Delegates: Moran, Blevins, Jackson
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senators: Hanger, Schrock, Lucas
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (37-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendments
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- House amendments rejected by Senate (19-Y 19-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Tie vote, chair votes nay
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (19-Y 19-N)
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Hamilton agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 004947532
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (37-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (19-Y 19-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor