+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 521 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB690ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
On August 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100089D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
January 24, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor