+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Continued to 2017 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N)
On December 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101430D
+ − Votes (3)
January 26, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
January 21, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor