+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Rereferred to Finance
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 1-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985385629-E
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985385629
- Referred to Committee on Finance