+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB69ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101491D
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor