+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Incorporated in other legislation (SB0709, Colgan)
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- No action taken by Finance by voice vote
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 975707745-E
On January 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
- Introduced bill reprinted 975707745
On January 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 975707745
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 24, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1997: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor