+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0251)
On March 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 251 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB688ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 24, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed LD1774661-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On January 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD1774661