+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (63)
On April 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
On April 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB687ER)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 785 (effective 4/6/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 5-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (95-Y 5-N)
On April 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On March 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Signed by President
On March 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB687ER)
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Emergency clause added by conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
- House floor sub. accepted by conf. committee
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 37-N)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF. (39-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Gartlan, Marye, Calhoun
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Croshaw, Marshall, Mayer
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time
- Floor substitute agreed to LD4495180-H1 (Croshaw)
- Floor substitute printed LD4495180-H1 (Croshaw)
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. LD4495180-H1 (Croshaw)
- Passed House with fl. substitute (93-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD3574661-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed LD3574661
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 5-N)
April 5, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 37-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF. (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1995: Reported from P. & E. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor