+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- DEFEATED (20-Y 79-N)
- Defeated by House (20-Y 79-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Read third time
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: FOIA
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 088233272-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB686E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 088233272
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2008: VOTE: --- DEFEATED (20-Y 79-N)
February 28, 2008: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2008: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor