+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
On April 2, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 432 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB68ER)
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 025440560-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/28/01 025440560
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2002: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 10, 2002: Reported from Transportation w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor