+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 578 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB679ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB679S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105069D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16105069D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 16104229D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 29, 2016: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2016: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor