+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 835 (effective 7/1/12)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB678ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (79-Y 17-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 6-N)
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB678ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 12106195D-S1
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 6-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 6-N)
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Delegates: Gilbert, Jones, James
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senators: McDougle, Martin, Petersen
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (37-Y 3-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N)
- Passed House with substitute (76-Y 22-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB678H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105498D-H1
- Read third time
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105498D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Engrossment waived SB678E
- Rules suspended (37-Y 2-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 12104240D
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (14)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 6-N)
March 10, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 6-N)
March 10, 2012: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
February 28, 2012: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 3-N)
February 24, 2012: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
February 22, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N)
February 16, 2012: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2012: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N)
February 10, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N)
February 9, 2012: Rules suspended (37-Y 2-N)
February 8, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor