+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
On April 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 361 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB677ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Amendment by Mr. Joannou agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (90-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (20-Y 4-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Engrossed bill reprinted 989812718-E
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989812718-E
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 989812718
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (20-Y 4-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor