+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB677ER)
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected
- Passed House (89-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 1-N)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 8
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 4-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB677E
- Printed as engrossed 048429804-E
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 048429804
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 11-N)
March 8, 2004: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 1-N)
February 23, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 4-N)
February 9, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor